EP0421459 - Air conditioning apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1994 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.1994 [1994/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/15] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takashi, Nakamura, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Wakayama Seisakusho, 5-66, Tebira 6-chome Wakayama-shi, Wakayama-ken / JP | 02 /
Tani, Hidekazu, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Wakayama Seisakusho, 5-66, Tebira 6-chome Wakayama-shi, Wakayama-ken / JP | 03 /
Kasai, Tomohiko, Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Wakayama Seisakusho, 5-66, Tebira 6-chome Wakayama-shi, Wakayama-ken / JP | [1991/15] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Roland, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/15] | Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 W-8000 München 40 / DE | Application number, filing date | 90119142.9 | 05.10.1990 | [1991/15] | Priority number, date | JP19890262358 | 06.10.1989 Original published format: JP 26235889 | [1991/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0421459 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0421459 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0421459 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F24F1/02, F24F3/06, F25B13/00 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
F25B13/00 (EP,US);
F24F11/30 (EP,US);
F24F11/32 (EP,US);
F24F3/065 (EP,US);
F25B41/20 (EP,US);
F25B2313/006 (EP,US);
F25B2313/023 (EP,US);
F25B2313/0272 (EP,US);
F25B2400/05 (EP,US);
F25B2500/01 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1991/15] | F24F1/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1991/15] | Title | German: | Klimagerät | [1991/15] | English: | Air conditioning apparatus | [1991/15] | French: | Dispositif de conditionnement d'air | [1991/15] | Examination procedure | 12.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/15] | 17.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4760707 (DENNIS RICHARD D [US], et al); | [A]EP0316685 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]GB2213248 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) |