EP0423570 - Slide fastener slider [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.1995 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.05.1995 [1995/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YKK Corporation No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/49] | For all designated states YKK CORPORATION No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1991/17] | For all designated states YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K. No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Terada, Yasuharu 2-14, Ekimaeshin-machi Uozu-shi, Toyama-ken / JP | 02 /
Ishii, Susumu 16, Ueki Kurobe-shi, Toyama-ken / JP | 03 /
Mizuno, Hiroshi 15-27, Yotsuba-cho Toyama-shi, Toyama-ken / JP | [1991/17] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90119193.2 | 05.10.1990 | [1991/17] | Priority number, date | JP19890121345U | 17.10.1989 Original published format: JP 12134589 U | [1991/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0423570 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0423570 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A44B19/26 | [1991/17] | CPC: |
A44B19/26 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T24/2568 (EP,US);
Y10T24/2586 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/17] | Title | German: | Reissverschlussschieber | [1991/17] | English: | Slide fastener slider | [1991/17] | French: | Curseur pour fermeture à glissière | [1991/17] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/38] | 27.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2316133 (SCHAAFF LOUIS W); | [A]US2864146 (MORIN LOUIS H); | [A]US2752655 (CARLILE ALFRED E); | [A]US2178948 (JOSEPH BROZEK); | [A]US2307711 (SCHAAFF LOUIS W); | [A]FR1282614 (FR DE FERMETURES DE LUXE SOC); | [A]US2785452 (GARSSON HENRY M) |