EP0422579 - Vacuum cleaner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1995 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.1995 [1995/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/16] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sunagawa, Masao Dia Palace Mito 201, 8-2, Joutou 2-chome Mito-shi, Ibaraki 310 / JP | 02 /
Sagawa, Kouiti 31-3, Moriyama-cho 2-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316 / JP | [1991/16] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/16] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90119328.4 | 09.10.1990 | [1991/16] | Priority number, date | JP19890264935 | 13.10.1989 Original published format: JP 26493589 | [1991/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0422579 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0422579 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A47L5/36, A47L9/00 | [1991/16] | CPC: |
A47L9/009 (EP,US);
A47L9/00 (KR);
A47L5/365 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1991/16] | Title | German: | Staubsauger | [1991/16] | English: | Vacuum cleaner | [1991/16] | French: | Aspirateur de poussières | [1991/16] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 19.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/16] | 26.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB343894 (EDWIN JUELSON); | [X]FR2449431 (OUEST APPLIC MECA); | [Y]US2771151 (OSBORN RALPH C); | [Y]GB925272 (NAT UNION ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]US3996641 (EICHHOLZ ARTHUR H); | [A]US2937396 (MOMBERG JAMES W, et al); | [A]US2889570 (DUFF JACK E); | [XP]EP0362895 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]DE3024487 (HOHENLOHER SPEZIALMOEBEL [DE]); | [AD]JPS4329421Y |