EP0422605 - Pneumatic tire for passenger car [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD. 36-11, Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/46] | For all designated states THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD. 36-11, Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1991/16] | For all designated states THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD. 36-11, Shinbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimomura, Iwao 490, Tokunobu Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Narahashi, Shigeki 490, Tokunobu Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1991/16] | Representative(s) | Füchsle, Klaus, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/16] | Füchsle, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90119404.3 | 10.10.1990 | [1991/16] | Priority number, date | JP19890262902 | 11.10.1989 Original published format: JP 26290289 | [1991/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0422605 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0422605 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0422605 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60C15/06 | [1991/16] | CPC: |
B60C15/06 (EP,US);
B60C2015/0614 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10828 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10837 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10846 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/16] | Title | German: | Luftreifen für PKW | [1991/16] | English: | Pneumatic tire for passenger car | [1991/16] | French: | Bandages pneumatiques pour voitures | [1991/16] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 20.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/09] | 19.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE860151 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG); | [A]FR2299978 (UNIROYAL [FR]); | [A]EP0072956 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]FR2512748 (DUNLOP SA [FR]); | [A]US4502520 (SANDSTROM PAUL H [US]); | [A]EP0334955 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) |