EP0422625 - Reciprocating applicator roller in an inking unit on a printing press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.1995 [1995/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Christian-Pless-Strasse 6-30 63012 Offenbach/Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/36] | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Christian-Pless-Strasse 6-30 D-63012 Offenbach/Main / DE | ||
Former [1991/16] | For all designated states MAN MILLER DRUCKMASCHINEN GMBH Chauvignystrasse 21, Postfach 1163 D-65358 Geisenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simeth, Claus Geschw.-Scholl-Str.17 W-6050 Offenbach / DE | [1991/16] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1993/36] |
Former [1991/16] | Schubert, Siegmar, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Weinhold, Dannenberg, Dr. Gudel, Schubert Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 D-60313 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 90119447.2 | 10.10.1990 | [1991/16] | Priority number, date | DE19893934070 | 12.10.1989 Original published format: DE 3934070 | [1991/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0422625 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0422625 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B41F31/14 | [1991/16] | CPC: |
B41F31/15 (EP,US);
Y10S101/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/27] |
Former [1991/16] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Changierende Auftragswalze eines Farbwerks einer Druckmaschine | [1991/16] | English: | Reciprocating applicator roller in an inking unit on a printing press | [1991/16] | French: | Rouleau applicateur à mouvement de va-et-vient dans un dispositif d'encrage de machine d'impression | [1991/16] | Examination procedure | 11.11.1990 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, DK, GR, LU | 14.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/19] | 20.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.12.1990 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.1990 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.1990 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.1990 | LU   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4718344 (LEMASTER MILTON R [US]); | [A]DE3800658 (KOTTERER GRAFOTEC [DE]); | [AP]DE9001560U | Examination | EP0313702 |