Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0394964 | Global Dossier | 02.08.1995 | B1 | EP0394964 | 26.06.1991 | A3 | EP0394964 | 31.10.1990 | A2 | Priority number | Date | AU8600791 | 18.10.1991 | JP10581989 | 27.04.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU645616B | Global Dossier | 20.01.1994 | B2 | AU8600791 | 13.05.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | JP26904789 | 18.10.1989 | AU8600791 | 18.10.1991 | JP12548690 | 17.05.1990 | JP13120790 | 23.05.1990 | JP10581989 | 27.04.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0423624 | Global Dossier | 24.01.1996 | B1 | EP0423624 | 24.04.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP26904789 | 18.10.1989 | AU8600791 | 18.10.1991 | JP12548690 | 17.05.1990 | JP13120790 | 23.05.1990 | JP10581989 | 27.04.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69021251T | 04.01.1996 | T2 | DE69021251D1 | 07.09.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | AU8600791 | 18.10.1991 | JP10581989 | 27.04.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69025022T | 30.05.1996 | T2 | DE69025022D1 | 07.03.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP26904789 | 18.10.1989 | AU8600791 | 18.10.1991 | JP12548690 | 17.05.1990 | JP13120790 | 23.05.1990 | JP10581989 | 27.04.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2563658B | 11.12.1996 | B2 | JPH0499202 | 31.03.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21028290 | 10.08.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2612954B | 21.05.1997 | B2 | JPH0426745 | 29.01.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | AU8600791 | 18.10.1991 | JP13120790 | 23.05.1990 | JP10581989 | 27.04.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH07110962B | 29.11.1995 | B2 | JPH02285001 | 22.11.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | AU8600791 | 18.10.1991 | JP10581989 | 27.04.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0765149B | 12.07.1995 | B2 | JPH03207846 | 11.09.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP26904789 | 18.10.1989 | AU8600791 | 18.10.1991 | JP12548690 | 17.05.1990 | JP10581989 | 27.04.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR930009988B | 13.10.1993 | B1 | KR910008159 | 30.05.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP26904789 | 18.10.1989 | AU8600791 | 18.10.1991 | JP12548690 | 17.05.1990 | JP13120790 | 23.05.1990 | JP10581989 | 27.04.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5198026 | 30.03.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US51501490 | 18.10.1990 | AU8600791 | 18.10.1991 | JP21028290 | 10.08.1990 | JP10581989 | 27.04.1989 | US59954890 | 18.10.1990 | US76541091 | 25.09.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5200276 | 06.04.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | JP26904789 | 18.10.1989 | US59551590 | 11.10.1990 | AU8600791 | 18.10.1991 | JP12548690 | 17.05.1990 | US91401392 | 15.07.1992 | JP13120790 | 23.05.1990 | JP10581989 | 27.04.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5364478 | 15.11.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US425593 | 14.01.1993 | JP26904789 | 18.10.1989 | US59551590 | 11.10.1990 | AU8600791 | 18.10.1991 | JP12548690 | 17.05.1990 | US91401392 | 15.07.1992 | JP13120790 | 23.05.1990 | JP10581989 | 27.04.1989 |