EP0422671 - Universal crayon sharpener [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.1994 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.1994 [1994/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BINNEY & SMITH INC. 1100 Church Lane P.O.431 Easton Pennsylvania 18044-0431 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/16] | For all designated states BINNEY & SMITH INC. 1100 Church Lane P.O.431 Easton Pennsylvania 18044-0431 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dietterich, Charles William HCR No. 1, Box 608 Brodheadsville, Pennsylvania 18322 / US | 02 /
Yehl, Gregory Carl 6020 Shepherd Hills Avenue Wescosville, Pennsylvania 18106 / US | 03 /
Lidle, Harry James, Jr. 1735 Hamlet Drive Macungie, Pennsylvania 18062 / US | [1991/16] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/16] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90119605.5 | 12.10.1990 | [1991/16] | Priority number, date | US19890420583 | 12.10.1989 Original published format: US 420583 | [1991/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0422671 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B43L23/08 | [1991/16] | CPC: |
B43L23/08 (EP,US);
B43K19/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/16] | Title | German: | Universeller Bleistiftanspitzer | [1991/16] | English: | Universal crayon sharpener | [1991/16] | French: | Taille-crayon universel | [1991/16] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 14.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/50] | 20.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/10] | 30.09.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4066109 (NARANG RAJENDRA K, et al); | [A]US4485862 (MATTHEIS HARLEY H [US], et al) |