EP0423648 - Wafer processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.1994 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.1994 [1994/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takamatsu, Tsukasa, c/o Fujitsu Ltd. Patent Department, 1015 Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | [1991/17] | Representative(s) | Sunderland, James Harry, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | Sunderland, James Harry, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 90119622.0 | 12.10.1990 | [1991/17] | Priority number, date | JP19890273945 | 20.10.1989 Original published format: JP 27394589 | [1991/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0423648 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/302 | [1991/17] | CPC: |
H01L21/302 (EP);
H01L21/68 (KR);
H01L23/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/17] | Title | German: | Plättchen-Verarbeitung | [1991/17] | English: | Wafer processing | [1991/17] | French: | Traitement de plaquettes | [1991/17] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 23.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/29] | 15.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/30] | 23.02.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57045929 ; | [A]JP60219750 ; | [X]EP0146197 (STAUFFER CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [A]DE3040675 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]); | [A]EP0260994 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 119 (E-116)[997], 3rd July 1982; & JP-A-57 045 929 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 16-03-1982, & JP57045929 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 69 (E-389)[2126], 18th March 1986; & JP-A-60 219 750 (FUJITSU K.K.) 02-11-1985, & JP60219750 A 00000000 |