EP0423811 - Sheet transport unit for recording systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.1996 [1996/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyauchi, Yasuo, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Souhei, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1991/17] | Representative(s) | Grupe, Peter, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne-Grupe-Pellmann-Grams-Struif Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | Grupe, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne-Grupe-Pellmann-Grams-Struif Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90120089.9 | 19.10.1990 | [1991/17] | Priority number, date | JP19890273174 | 20.10.1989 Original published format: JP 27317489 | [1991/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0423811 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0423811 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0423811 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B41J29/38 | [1991/17] | CPC: |
B41J13/0018 (EP,US);
B41J2/16508 (EP,US);
B41J2/16532 (EP,US);
Y10S400/902 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/17] | Title | German: | Blattzuführeinheit für Aufzeichnungssysteme | [1991/17] | English: | Sheet transport unit for recording systems | [1991/17] | French: | Unité d'entraînement de feuilles pour systèmes d'enregistrement | [1991/17] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/17] | 04.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57203578 ; | [A]JP62233273 ; | [A]JP62286757 ; | [A]EP0251725 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US4769585 (TANUMA JIRO [JP], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 59 (M-199)[1204], 11th March 1983; & JP-A-57 203 578 (OKI DENKI) 13-12-1982, & JP57203578 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 98 (M-680)[2945], 31st March 1988; & JP-A-62 233 273 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC) 13-10-1987, & JP62233273 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 171 (M-700)[3018], 21st May 1988; & JP-A-62 286 757 (NEC CORP.) 12-12-1987, & JP62286757 A 00000000 |