EP0429857 - Method for measuring the deviation between the movements of a machine which are created about a rotational axis and along two translational axes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.1995 [1995/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knapp, Wolfgang, Dr. La Sauge CH-1534 Sassel / CH | [1991/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knapp, Wolfgang, Dr. La Sauge CH-1534 Sassel / CH | 02 /
Hrovat, Stojan Trottenstrasse 79 CH-8037 Zürich / CH | [1991/23] | Representative(s) | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 8008 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/23] | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 CH-8008 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 90120504.7 | 25.10.1990 | [1991/23] | Priority number, date | CH19890004238 | 27.11.1989 Original published format: CH 423889 | [1991/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0429857 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/18, G01B21/04 | [1991/23] | CPC: |
G01B21/042 (EP);
G05B19/401 (EP);
G05B2219/37619 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Messung der Abweichung zwischen Bewegungen einer Maschine, die um eine Drehachse und mit zwei Translationsachsen erzeugt werden | [1991/23] | English: | Method for measuring the deviation between the movements of a machine which are created about a rotational axis and along two translational axes | [1991/23] | French: | Procédé pour mesurer l'écart des mouvements d'une machine obtenus par un axe de rotation et deux axes de translation | [1991/23] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 25.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/52] | 22.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/18] | 05.12.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1995/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0258471 |