EP0426041 - Spiral groove seal system for sealing a high pressure gas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOHN CRANE, INC. 6400 Oakton Street Morton Grove, IL 60053 / US | [1991/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pecht, Glenn G. 3730 North Sheffield Chicago, IL 60613 / US | 02 /
Feltman, Paul L., Jr 5322 South Ashland Avenue Chicago, IL 60609 / US | [1991/19] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/19] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90120611.0 | 26.10.1990 | [1991/19] | Priority number, date | US19890428952 | 30.10.1989 Original published format: US 428952 | [1991/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0426041 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0426041 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/34, F16J15/00 | [1991/19] | CPC: |
F16J15/3412 (EP,US);
F16J15/16 (KR);
F16J15/006 (EP,US);
F16J15/3484 (EP,US);
Y10S277/921 (EP,US);
Y10S277/928 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/19] | Title | German: | Dichtungsanordnung mit spiralförmiger Nute für Hochdruckgas | [1991/19] | English: | Spiral groove seal system for sealing a high pressure gas | [1991/19] | French: | Système d'étanchéité à gorge spiralée pour gaz sous haute pression | [1991/19] | Examination procedure | 11.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/45] | 02.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.1995 | CH | 10.05.1995 | GR | 10.05.1995 | LI | 10.05.1995 | ES | 27.10.1995 | SE | 27.10.1995 | LU | 31.10.1995 | [2004/37] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 10.05.1995 | |
CH | 10.05.1995 | ||
GR | 10.05.1995 | ||
LI | 10.05.1995 | ||
SE | 27.10.1995 | ||
LU | 31.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/32] | AT | 10.05.1995 | |
CH | 10.05.1995 | ||
LI | 10.05.1995 | ||
SE | 27.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | AT | 10.05.1995 | |
CH | 10.05.1995 | ||
LI | 10.05.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | CH | 10.05.1995 | |
LI | 10.05.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2308032 (SIGMA VYZKUMNY USTAV CERPACICH [SU]); | [A]EP0037210 (CRANE HOUDAILLE JOHN INC [US]); | [AD]WO8809891 (CRANE JOHN INC [US]) |