blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0426087

EP0426087 - Dye fixing material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.11.1997
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 02.01.2008  [2008/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210 Nakanuma
Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1991/19]For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi
Kanagawa / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nakamura, Yoshisada, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
210 Nakanuma
Minami Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[1991/19]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1991/19]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date90120741.529.10.1990
[1991/19]
Priority number, dateJP1989028231630.10.1989         Original published format: JP 28231689
[1991/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0426087
Date:08.05.1991
Language:EN
[1991/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0426087
Date:02.01.1992
Language:EN
[1992/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0426087
Date:22.01.1997
Language:EN
[1997/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.1991
ClassificationIPC:G03C8/40, G03C8/26
[1991/19]
CPC:
G03C8/4066 (EP); G03C8/26 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1991/19]
TitleGerman:Material zur Fixierung von Farbstoffen[1997/04]
English:Dye fixing material[1991/19]
French:Matériau de fixation de colorant[1991/19]
Former [1991/19]Material zum Befestigen von Farbstoffen
Examination procedure27.02.1992Examination requested  [1992/17]
09.03.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.09.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.07.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.08.1996Fee for grant paid
27.08.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.10.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1998/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
31.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR22.01.1997
IT22.01.1997
NL22.01.1997
[2006/14]
Former [2003/07]IT22.01.1997
NL22.01.1997
FR20.06.1997
Former [1999/42]IT22.01.1997
FR20.06.1997
Former [1997/44]FR20.06.1997
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPS63147166  ;
 [YD]JPS62173463  ;
 [Y]DE2835324
ExaminationEP0386761
 EP0411466
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.