EP0426110 - Ion thruster for interplanetary space mission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/19] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iida, Hiroshi, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kuriki, Kyoichi 29-21, Haneki 1-chome, Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kuninaka, Hitoshi 1945, Higashi-naganuma Inagi-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1991/19] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/19] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90120797.7 | 30.10.1990 | [1991/19] | Priority number, date | JP19890285815 | 31.10.1989 Original published format: JP 28581589 | JP19890285816 | 31.10.1989 Original published format: JP 28581689 | [1991/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0426110 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0426110 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0426110 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F03H1/00 | [1991/19] | CPC: |
H01J27/16 (EP,US);
F03H1/0043 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/19] | Title | German: | Ionenantrieb für Weltraumflüge | [1996/14] | English: | Ion thruster for interplanetary space mission | [1991/19] | French: | Propulsion ionique pour mission dans l'espace interplanétaire | [1991/19] |
Former [1991/19] | Ionenantrieb für Weltraumreisen | Examination procedure | 28.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/19] | 26.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3757518 (BAHR A); | [X]US3866414 (BAHR ALFRED); | [A]US3913320 (READER PAUL D, et al) |