EP0446420 - Process for the preparation of alkyl isothiocyanates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1994 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.1994 [1994/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 D-60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giesselmann, Günther, Dr. Gravenbrucherweg 17 W-6056 Heusenstamm / DE | 02 /
Günther, Kurt, Dr. Langenselbolderweg 45 W-6455 Erlensee / DE | [1991/38] | Application number, filing date | 90120855.3 | 31.10.1990 | [1991/38] | Priority number, date | DE19904001020 | 16.01.1990 Original published format: DE 4001020 | [1991/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0446420 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0446420 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07C331/20 | [1991/38] | CPC: |
C07C331/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Alkylisothiocyansäureestern | [1991/38] | English: | Process for the preparation of alkyl isothiocyanates | [1991/38] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'isothiocyanates d'alkyl | [1991/38] | Examination procedure | 31.10.1990 | Examination requested [1991/38] | 07.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2105473 | [AD] - "Ullmanns Encyklopädie der technischen Chemie", 4. neubearbeitete und erweiterte Aulage, 1983, Seiten 154-159, Verlag Chemie, Weinheim, DE; "2. Organische Isothiocyanate" |