EP0427150 - Process for production of sorbitol and gluconic acid or gluconate and biomass therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR, NL | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH 52425 Jülich / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/20] | For all designated states FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JÜLICH GMBH Wilhelm-Johnen-Strasse D-52425 Jülich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rehr, Bert, Dr. Kopernikusstrasse 66 W-5170 Jülich / DE | 02 /
Sahm, Hermann, Prof. Wendelinusstrasse 71 W-5170 Jülich / DE | [1991/20] | Application number, filing date | 90121064.1 | 02.11.1990 | [1991/20] | Priority number, date | DE19893936757 | 04.11.1989 Original published format: DE 3936757 | [1991/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0427150 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0427150 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/18, C12P7/58 | [1991/20] | CPC: |
C12P7/18 (EP,US);
C12P7/58 (EP,US);
Y10S435/822 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, NL [1991/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Gewinnung von Sorbit und Gluconsäure bzw. Gluconat und dafür geeignete Zellmassen | [1991/20] | English: | Process for production of sorbitol and gluconic acid or gluconate and biomass therefor | [1991/20] | French: | Procédé d'obtention de sorbitol et d'acide gluconique ou de gluconate et biomasse appropriée | [1991/20] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 11.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/32] | 08.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 06.09.1995 | FR | 06.09.1995 | NL | 06.09.1995 | AT | 02.11.1995 | [2015/21] |
Former [2000/27] | BE | 06.09.1995 | |
AT | 02.11.1995 | ||
NL | 30.11.1995 | ||
FR | 02.02.1996 | ||
Former [1997/16] | BE | 06.09.1995 | |
AT | 02.11.1995 | ||
FR | 02.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/30] | BE | 06.09.1995 | |
FR | 02.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/22] | BE | 06.09.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0322723 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) | [YD] - ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY vol. 120, 1982, NEW YORK US Seiten 211 - 234; HANSRUEDI FELIX: "Permeabilized cells" | [Y] - APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY vol. 29, 1988, BERLIN Seiten 19 - 24; CHUN U.H. et al: "The simultaneous production of sorbitol from fructose and gluconic acid from glucose using an oxidoreductase of Z.mobilis" | [A] - APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTEHNOLOGY vol. 20, 1984, BERLIN Seiten 118 - 123; VIIKARI l.: "Formation of sorbitol by Z.mobilis" | Examination | US4755467 | - CHUN U.H. et al: "The simultaneous production of sorbitol from fructose andgluconic acid from glucose using an oxidoreductase of Z.mobilis" |