blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0428030

EP0428030 - Process for the separation of gamma-butyrolactone from mixtures containing diethyl succinate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.08.1995
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.08.1995No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.10.1995 [1995/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1991/21]For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Fischer, Rolf, Dr.
Bergstrasse 98
W-6900 Heidelberg / DE
02 / Stops, Peter
Limburgstrasse 12
W-6701 Altrip / DE
03 / Brunner, Erwin, Dr.
Neuhausener Weg 1
W-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE
04 / Weigand, Rudolf
Luisenstrasse 13
W-6835 Bruehl / DE
[1991/21]
Application number, filing date90121090.603.11.1990
[1991/21]
Priority number, dateDE1989393812116.11.1989         Original published format: DE 3938121
[1991/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0428030
Date:22.05.1991
Language:DE
[1991/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0428030
Date:21.11.1991
Language:DE
[1991/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0428030
Date:12.10.1994
Language:DE
[1994/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.1991
ClassificationIPC:C07D307/33
[1991/21]
CPC:
C07D315/00 (EP,US); Y10S203/20 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1991/21]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Abtrennung von gamma-Butyrolacton aus Gemischen, die Bernsteinsäurediethylester enthalten[1991/21]
English:Process for the separation of gamma-butyrolactone from mixtures containing diethyl succinate[1991/21]
French:Procédé pour la séparation de gamma-butyrolactone de mélanges contenant du succinate de diéthyle[1991/21]
Examination procedure27.12.1990Examination requested  [1991/21]
21.02.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
06.04.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
12.04.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.05.1994Fee for grant paid
13.05.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.07.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.11.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0255400  (DAVY MCKEE LONDON [GB]);
 [AD]EP0256813  (DAVY MCKEE LONDON [GB])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.