EP0433626 - Physiologic waveform analysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.1994 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.1994 [1994/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WAYNE STATE UNIVERSITY 5557 Cass Avenue Detroit, MI 48202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/26] | For all designated states WAYNE STATE UNIVERSITY 380 Mackenzie Hall Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spitzer, Robert 4375 Borland West Bloomfield, Michigan 48033 / US | 02 /
Hassoun, Mohamed 7518 Oakman Dearborn, Michigan 48033 / US | [1991/26] | Representative(s) | Wharton, Peter Robert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/26] | Wharton, Peter Robert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Inventions House Valley Court, Canal Road Bradford BD1 4SP / GB | Application number, filing date | 90121115.1 | 05.11.1990 | [1991/26] | Priority number, date | US19890438581 | 17.11.1989 Original published format: US 438581 | [1991/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0433626 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0433626 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/20 | [1991/26] | CPC: |
A61B5/7267 (EP,US);
A61B5/397 (US);
A61B5/389 (EP);
G06N20/00 (EP,US);
G06N3/04 (EP,US);
G06N3/10 (EP,US);
G16H15/00 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
A61B5/7239 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/26] | Title | German: | Physiologische Wellenformanalyse | [1991/26] | English: | Physiologic waveform analysis | [1991/26] | French: | Analyse de courbe physiologique | [1991/26] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 27.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/22] | 01.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/47] | 29.06.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0329356 (UNIV WAYNE STATE [US]); | [A]EP0336608 (NEUROMEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US]) |