EP0427210 - Nonionic surface active agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.08.2000 [2000/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LION CORPORATION 3-7, Honjo 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/20] | For all designated states LION CORPORATION 3-7, Honjo 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sekiguchi, Shizuo No. 8-18, Miyagidai 2-chome Funabashi-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Yasumasu, Tomoko No. 586-1-604, Futago-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Miyake, Hiroshi No. 1-6-402, Tsudanuma 6-chome Narashino-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 04 /
Endo, Yoshihisa No. 7-6, Hachimandai 2-chome Sakura-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [1991/20] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/20] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90121231.6 | 06.11.1990 | [1991/20] | Priority number, date | JP19890288154 | 06.11.1989 Original published format: JP 28815489 | [1991/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0427210 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/20] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0427210 | Date: | 19.03.1992 | [1992/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0427210 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07H13/06, C07H15/04, A61K7/08, C11D1/66, A61K7/00 | [1995/02] | CPC: |
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/60 (EP,US);
A61K8/604 (EP,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
C07H13/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1991/20] | C07H13/06, C07H15/04, A61K7/16, A61K7/08, C11D1/66 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/20] | Title | German: | Nichtionisches Tensid | [1991/20] | English: | Nonionic surface active agent | [1991/20] | French: | Agent tensioactif non ionique | [1991/20] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/20] | 24.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.02.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/35] | 05.04.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/35] | Request for further processing for: | 15.07.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 15.07.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.08.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO8810147 (NOVO INDUSTRI AS [DK]) [XD] 1-5 * the whole document *; | JPS428004B [ ] (DAINIPPON SUGAR MANUFG. CO. LTD); | [X]EP0334498 (CERESTAR HOLDING BV [NL]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]WO8901480 (NOVO INDUSTRI AS [DK]) [X] 1-5 * page 7, line 7 - page 8, line 10; page 23, line 19 - page 24, line 14; claims 1-11 * | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19671204), vol. 67, no. 23, Database accession no. 108948N, page 10284 [X] 1-5 * abstract * | [X] - E. REINFELD ET AL., "Selektive Acylierung von D-Glucose", DIE STÄRKE, (1968), vol. 20, no. 6, pages 181 - 189 [X] 1-5 * the whole document * | [A] - K. YOSHIMOTO ET AL., "Regioselective Syntheses of Mono-O-acylglucoses", CHEM. PHARM. BULL., (1979), vol. 27, no. 11, pages 2661 - 2674 [A] 1-5 * page 2662; page 2671, lines 3 - 12 * |