EP0427274 - Texturing of acoustical mineral fiberboard with wheel blast machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.05.1996 [1996/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE CELOTEX CORPORATION 1500 North Dale Mabry Highway Tampa Florida 33607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/20] | For all designated states THE CELOTEX CORPORATION 1500 North Dale Mabry Highway Tampa Florida 33607 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boyd, Alan L. 8381 Monarch Circle North Seminole, Florida, 34642 / US | 02 /
Migliorini, Fred L. 12000 4th Street North, Apt. No. 22 St. Petersburg, Florida 33716 / US | [1991/20] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/20] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90121427.0 | 08.11.1990 | [1991/20] | Priority number, date | US19890433813 | 09.11.1989 Original published format: US 433813 | [1991/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0427274 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B24C1/06, B24C3/14, D21J1/20 | [1991/20] | CPC: |
B24C3/14 (EP);
B24C1/06 (EP);
B28B11/0818 (EP);
D21J1/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/20] | Title | German: | Strukturieren von einer Mineralfaserakustikplatte mit einer Schleuderstrahlmaschine | [1991/20] | English: | Texturing of acoustical mineral fiberboard with wheel blast machine | [1991/20] | French: | Gaufrage d'un panneau acoustique en fibres minérales par sablage | [1991/20] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 12.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/02] | 30.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 24.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 10.11.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/19] | 13.12.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/19] | Request for further processing for: | 24.01.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 24.01.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.02.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3832809 ; | [Y]CH374565 ; | [Y]EP0108381 ; | [A]GB851021 ; | [A]US3269066 ; | [APD]US4911788 ; | [A]CH447864 ; | [A]GB898172 ; | [A]US2434736 |