EP0427294 - Silicon carbide member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.1993 [1993/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/20] | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Madono, Junji No. 1-13, Kitago 4-chome Takefu-shi, Fukui-ken / JP | 02 /
Hayashi, Michio No. 23-26, Hachiman 1-chome Takefu-shi, Fukui-ken / JP | 03 /
Matsumoto, Fukuji No. 2-21, Kitago 3-chome Takefu-shi, Fukui-ken / JP | [1991/20] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/20] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90121517.8 | 09.11.1990 | [1991/20] | Priority number, date | JP19890293066 | 10.11.1989 Original published format: JP 29306689 | [1991/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0427294 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/32 | [1991/20] | CPC: |
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/52 (EP,US);
C04B41/89 (EP,US);
C23C16/325 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00405 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24975 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/565 (US,EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4531, C04B41/5059 (US,EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4531, C04B41/5059, C04B41/5096 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/20] | Title | German: | Siliziumkarbidglied | [1991/20] | English: | Silicon carbide member | [1991/20] | French: | Elément en carbure dea silicium | [1991/20] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 07.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/20] | 01.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/49] | 09.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63109170 ; | [A]JP61253366 ; | [A]JP62235393 ; | [A]FR1479015 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC); | [A]DE1302312 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 353 (C-530)[3200], 21st September 1988; & JP-A-63 109 170 (MITSUI ENG. & SHIPBUILD. CO., LTD) 13-05-1988, & JP63109170 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 106 (C-414)[2553], 3rd April 1987; & JP-A-61 253 366 (MITSUI ENG. & SHIPBUILD. CO., LTD) 11-11-1986, & JP61253366 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 107, no. 26, December 1987, page 148, abstract no. 239321v, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-62 235 393 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE PUBLIC CORP.) 15-10-1987, & JP62235393 A 00000000 |