EP0450153 - Hermetic terminal with electrically insulating anti-tracking cap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECUMSEH PRODUCTS COMPANY 100 East Patterson Street Tecumseh Michigan 49286 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | For all designated states TECUMSEH PRODUCTS COMPANY 100 East Patterson Street Tecumseh Michigan 49286 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itameri-Kinter, Terry 10 Oakridge Avenue North Attleboro, Massachusetts 02760 / US | 02 /
Sauerbrey, David W. 136 Banville Avenue Somerset, Massachusetts 02725 / US | [1991/41] | Representative(s) | Weitzel, Wolfgang Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | Weitzel, Wolfgang, Dr.-Ing. Friedenstrasse 10 D-89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 90121545.9 | 10.11.1990 | [1991/41] | Priority number, date | US19900497085 | 21.03.1990 Original published format: US 497085 | [1991/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0450153 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0450153 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0450153 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01B17/30, H01R13/74 | [1995/20] | CPC: |
H01R13/521 (EP,US);
H01B17/305 (EP,US);
H01R2201/10 (EP,US);
Y10S417/902 (EP,US);
Y10S439/926 (EP,US);
Y10S439/935 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/41] | H01R13/52 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1991/41] | Title | German: | Hermetischer Endstecker mit elektrisch isolierender Kappe | [1995/20] | English: | Hermetic terminal with electrically insulating anti-tracking cap | [1991/41] | French: | Boîte-terminal hermétique avec chape électriquement isolante | [1991/41] |
Former [1991/41] | Hermetischer Endstecker mit elektrisch isolierter Kappe | Examination procedure | 12.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/33] | 17.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.05.1995 | DE | 18.08.1995 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 17.05.1995 | |
DE | 18.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/01] | DE | 18.08.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3988053 (DODENHOFF JOHN A); | [YD]US2458748 (STUPAKOFF SEMON H); | [A]FR1164734 (RECH ETUDES PRODUCTION SARL) |