EP0433648 - Substituted pyrimidobenzimidazole derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.1994 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.1994 [1994/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Postfach 3255 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/26] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hubschwerlen, Christian, Dr. Rue de la Gendarmerie F-68200 Durmenach / FR | 02 /
Kompis, Ivan, Dr. Goldentalweg 16 CH-4104 Oberwil / CH | 03 /
Specklin, Jean-Luc Rue du 6ème Ric F-68680 Kembs-Loechle / FR | [1991/26] | Representative(s) | Martin, Björn, et al Grenzacherstrasse 124 Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | [1991/26] | Application number, filing date | 90121665.5 | 13.11.1990 | [1991/26] | Priority number, date | CH19890004165 | 21.11.1989 Original published format: CH 416589 | CH19900002688 | 17.08.1990 Original published format: CH 268890 | CH19900002817 | 30.08.1990 Original published format: CH 281790 | [1991/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0433648 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C07C275/40, C07D235/16, // (C07D487/04, 239:00, 235:00) | [1991/26] | CPC: |
C07D403/04 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07C275/40 (EP);
C07D235/16 (EP);
C07D487/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/26] | Title | German: | Substituierte Pyrimidobenzimidazolderivate | [1991/26] | English: | Substituted pyrimidobenzimidazole derivatives | [1991/26] | French: | Dérivés du pyrimidobenzimidazole substitués | [1991/26] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 13.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/26] | 29.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/48] | 30.06.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2930333 (BASF AG); | [A]EP0012983 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]US4209523 (LAFON LOUIS [FR]) | [A] - JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, Band 26, 1989 E.A.M. BADAWEY et al. "Benzimidazole Condensed Ring Systems 4(1). New Approaches to the Synthesis of Substituted Pyrimido (1,6-a)benzimidazole-1,3(2H, 5H)-diones" Seiten 405-408, seite 406. | [A] - JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, Band 26, 1989 E.A.M. BADAWEY et al. "Benzimidazole Condensed Ring Systems 5(1), Studies on the Synthesis of Pyrimido (1,6-a)benzimidazole-1,3(2H, 5H)-diones" Seiten 1401-1404, Seiten 1401, 1402. | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, 1965 H.J. DAVIES et al. "Pyrimido(3,4-a)benzimida- zole : A Novel Ring System" Seiten 5125-5127, Seiten 5125, 5126. |