EP0428132 - Pradimicin derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.1994 [1994/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/21] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 345 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10154 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamachi, Hajime 3-23-6, Irifune Urayasu / JP | 02 /
Iimura, Seiji 1-10-17, Kamata Setagaya-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Okuyama, Satsuki 807-1, Kobiki-cho Hachioji / JP | 04 /
Aburaki, Shimpei 4-24-1-302, Ikuta Tama-ku, Kawasaki / JP | 05 /
Naito, Takayuki 2667-45 Ohzenji Asao-ku, Kawasaki / JP | 06 /
Ueda, Yasutsugu 46 Olde Orchard Road Clinton, Connecticut 06413 / US | 07 /
Crast, Leonard B., Jr. 33 Black Walnut Drive, P.O. Box 706 Durham, Connecticut 06422 / US | 08 /
Mikkilineni, Amarendra B. 20 Northwoods Lane Middletown, Connecticut 06457 / US | [1991/21] | Representative(s) | Kinzebach, Werner, et al Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/21] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90121709.1 | 13.11.1990 | [1991/21] | Priority number, date | US19890436505 | 14.11.1989 Original published format: US 436505 | [1991/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0428132 | Date: | 22.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0428132 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07H15/244, A61K31/71 | [1991/21] | CPC: |
C07H15/244 (EP);
C07H15/24 (KR);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/21] | Title | German: | Pradimicin-Derivate | [1991/21] | English: | Pradimicin derivatives | [1991/21] | French: | Dérivés de pradimicin | [1991/21] | Examination procedure | 18.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/51] | 19.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0277621 (BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]); | [A]EP0315147 (MICROBIAL CHEM RES FOUND [JP]); | [XP]EP0351799 (BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) |