Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.1994 [1994/12] |
06.05.1993 | First examination report | |
05.03.1992 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.04.1992 [1992/17] |
23.10.1991 | Publication of search report | published on 11.12.1991 [1991/50] |
12.04.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.05.1991 [1991/22] |