EP0431358 - Rigid or flexible profiled strip material for covering the internal walls of metal profile members [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.1997 | Correction of patent application | published on 28.01.1998 [1998/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caoduro, Paolo Via Europa 15 36010 Zane' (Vicenza) / IT | For all designated states Caoduro, Carlo Via Chiuppese 15 I-36010 Montecello Conte Otto (Vicenza) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | For all designated states Caoduro, Paolo Via Europa 15 I-36010 Zane' (Vicenza) / IT | ||
For all designated states Caoduro, Carlo Via Chiuppese 15 I-36010 Montecello Conte Otto (Vicenza) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/24] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90121810.7 | 14.11.1990 | [1991/24] | Priority number, date | IT19890041761 | 07.12.1989 Original published format: IT 4176189 | [1991/24] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0431358 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/24] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0431358 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | [1998/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E04D3/08, E06B3/26 | [1991/24] | CPC: |
E04D3/08 (EP);
E06B3/263 (EP);
E04D2003/0818 (EP);
E04D2003/0831 (EP);
E04D2003/0887 (EP);
E06B2003/26323 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/24] | Title | German: | Steifes oder elastisches Profilbandmaterial für die Auskleidung der Innenflächen von Metallprofilen | [1991/24] | English: | Rigid or flexible profiled strip material for covering the internal walls of metal profile members | [1991/24] | French: | Matériau en bande profilée rigide ou flexible pour le garnissage des faces internes de profilés métalliques | [1991/24] | File destroyed: | 21.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 13.12.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/32] | 17.03.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2622710 (HAAS GLENN B); | [X]DE2801554 (WILLERT OTTO); | [X]FR2418325 (ROEHM GMBH [DE]); | [X]GB2137673 (MODERN ART GLASS COMPANY LIMIT) |