EP0485658 - Method for purifying gaseous hydrides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.01.1996 [1996/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAPAN PIONICS CO., LTD. Tokyo Sakurada Bldg. 8F., 1-3, Nishishinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | For all designated states JAPAN PIONICS CO., LTD. Tokyo Sakurada Bldg. 8F., 1-3, Nishishinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koichi, Kitahara 3-2-18, Fujigaoka Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Takashi, Shimada 3-20-4-304, Jutsukenzaka Chigasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Keiichi, Iwata 2-4-34, Suwa, Kameda-machi Nakakanbara-gun, Niigata / JP | [1992/21] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90121918.8 | 15.11.1990 | [1992/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0485658 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0485658 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C01B6/34, C01B19/04, C01B17/16, C01B25/06, C01B33/04 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
C01B6/34 (EP,US);
C01B17/168 (EP,US);
C01B19/04 (EP,US);
C01B25/06 (EP,US);
C01B33/046 (EP,US);
C01P2006/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Reinigen von gasförmigen Hydriden | [1992/21] | English: | Method for purifying gaseous hydrides | [1992/21] | French: | Procédé de purification d'hydrures gazeux | [1992/21] | Examination procedure | 26.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/34] | 26.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP54160577 [ ]; | JP03012303 [ ]; | JP03012304 [ ]; | JP61209030 [ ]; | JP02141406 [ ]; | JP02204306 [ ]; | [A]US4565677 (YUSA ATSUSHI [JP]); | [A]EP0248224 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH [DE]); | [X]EP0314542 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]); | [A]EP0361386 (JAPAN PIONICS [JP]) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 4, no. 22 (C-074) 23 February 1980, & JP-A-54 160577 (TEIJIN LTD) 19 December 1979,, & JP54160577 A 19791219 | [ ] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX (Latest) Accession No. 91-062599, Week 09, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; & JP-A-03 012 303 (NIPPON PIONICS KK) 21-01-1991, & JP03012303 A 00000000 | [ ] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX (Latest) Accession No. 91-062600, week 09 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; & JP-A-03 012 304 (NIPPON PIONICS KK) 21-01-1991, & JP03012304 A 00000000 | [ ] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX (Latest) Accession No. 86-287478, Week 44, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; & JP-A-61 209 030 (NIPPON PIONICS KK) 17-09-1986, & JP61209030 A 00000000 | [ ] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX (Latest) Accession No. 90-212415, Week 28, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; & JP-A-02 141 406 (NIPPON PIONICS KK) 30-05-1990, & JP02141406 A 00000000 | [ ] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX (Latest), Accession No. 90-287720, Week 38, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; & JP-A-02 204 306 (NIPPON PIONICS KK) 14-08-1990, & JP02204306 A 00000000 | Examination | JP03012303 | - World Patents Index (Latest), Accession No. 91-062599, week 09, Derwent Publications Ltd., London GB & JP-A-03012303, & JP03012303 A 00000000 |