EP0431367 - Adjusting device for the lower cutter of a shear in a band or plate welding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.1994 [1994/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oxytechnik Ges. für Systemtechnik mbH Frankfurter Strasse 10 65760 Eschborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | For all designated states Oxytechnik Ges. für Systemtechnik mbH Frankfurter Strasse 10 D-65760 Eschborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, Helmut Roedmühlstrasse 27a W-6367 Karben 6 / DE | [1991/24] | Representative(s) | Berdux, Klaus Höhenstrasse 17 63829 Krombach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/30] | Berdux, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Höhenstrasse 17 D-63829 Krombach / DE | ||
Former [1991/24] | Roesner, Werner MESSER GRIESHEIM GmbH, Patentabteilung, Hanauer Landstrasse 330, PF 101530 D-6230 Frankfurt 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 90121934.5 | 16.11.1990 | [1991/24] | Priority number, date | DE19893940511 | 07.12.1989 Original published format: DE 3940511 | [1991/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0431367 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0431367 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B23D35/00 | [1991/24] | CPC: |
B23D35/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1991/24] | Title | German: | Einstelleinrichtung für Untermesser einer Schere in einer Band- oder Blechplatten-Schweissanlage | [1991/24] | English: | Adjusting device for the lower cutter of a shear in a band or plate welding machine | [1991/24] | French: | Dispositif de réglage du couteau inférieur d'une cisaille d'une machine à souder des bandes ou des tôles | [1991/24] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 29.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/30] | 18.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/48] | 30.06.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE6609625U ; | [X]DE2646565 ; | [X]DE624919 ; | [A]FR1411043 |