EP0429028 - Ballast for a plurality of discharge lamps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.07.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRILUX-LENZE GmbH + Co. KG Heidestrasse 59759 Arnsberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/22] | For all designated states TRILUX-LENZE GmbH & Co. KG Heidestrasse D-59759 Arnsberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hasemann, Fred, Dr.-Ing. Zum Golfplatz 6 W-5760 Arnsberg 1 / DE | 02 /
Mertens, Ferdinand, Dipl.-Ing. Samlandweg 4 W-5760 Arnsberg 1 / DE | 03 /
Wittig, Norbert, Dipl.-Ing. Mühlenberg 62a W-5760 Arnsberg 1 / DE | [1991/22] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1991/22] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 90121991.5 | 17.11.1990 | [1991/22] | Priority number, date | DE19893938676 | 22.11.1989 Original published format: DE 3938676 | [1991/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0429028 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0429028 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/36, H05B41/29 | [1992/30] | CPC: |
H05B41/36 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/22] | H05B41/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/22] | Title | German: | Vorschaltgerät für mehrere Entladungslampen | [1991/22] | English: | Ballast for a plurality of discharge lamps | [1991/22] | French: | Ballast pour plusieurs lampes à décharge | [1991/22] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 11.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/37] | 09.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.04.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/38] | 04.05.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4260932 (JOHNSON VANCE); | [A]US4484105 (KRIETE RICHARD J [US], et al); | [A]EP0298934 (DENKOSHA KK [JP]) |