EP0448788 - Quick coupling device for an excavator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.1995 [1995/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr.Ing.h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 42 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | For all designated states Dr.Ing.h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 42 D-70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stenger, Reinhard Salzaeckerstrasse 66 W-7000 Stuttgart 80 / DE | [1991/40] | Application number, filing date | 90122462.6 | 26.11.1990 | [1991/40] | Priority number, date | DE19904010224 | 30.03.1990 Original published format: DE 4010224 | [1991/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0448788 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0448788 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/36 | [1991/40] | CPC: |
E02F3/3627 (EP,US);
E02F3/3631 (EP,US);
E02F3/3663 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, GB, SE [1991/40] | Title | German: | Schnellwechselvorrichtung für einen Bagger | [1991/40] | English: | Quick coupling device for an excavator | [1991/40] | French: | Dispositif d'accouplement rapide pour excavateur | [1991/40] | Examination procedure | 08.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/01] | 09.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 24.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/44] | Request for further processing for: | 24.08.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 24.08.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.09.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2304726 (LIEBHERR HYDRAULIKBAGGER [DE]); | [A]GB2132584 (DOBSON PARK IND); | [A]EP0273828 (PONCIN GILLES); | [A]DE9001617U |