EP0430187 - Digital circuit with switching stages of the complementary MOS type [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.1991 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.07.1991 [1991/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/23] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barré, Claude, Dipl.-Ing. Implerstrasse 23 W-8000 München 70 / DE | [1991/23] | Application number, filing date | 90122682.9 | 27.11.1990 | [1991/23] | Priority number, date | DE19893939637 | 30.11.1989 Original published format: DE 3939637 | [1991/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0430187 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0430187 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/017, H03K19/0948 | [1991/23] | CPC: |
H03K19/0013 (EP);
H03K19/01707 (EP);
H03K19/1735 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/23] | Title | German: | Digitalschaltung mit Schaltstufen nach Art der komplementären MOS-Schaltungstechnik | [1991/23] | English: | Digital circuit with switching stages of the complementary MOS type | [1991/23] | French: | Circuit logique avec des étages commutateurs du type MOS complémentaire | [1991/23] | File destroyed: | 05.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/23] | 08.05.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4649295 ; | [Y]US4124899 ; | [X]JPS6010920 ; | [A]JPS6298825 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 9, Nr. 123 (E-317)[1846]28. Mai 1985; & JP-A-60 10 920 (MITSUBISHI DENKI) 21-01-1985 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 11, Nr. 306 (E-546)[2753]6. Oktober 1987; & JP-A-62 98 825 (SEIKO EPSON) 08-05-1987 |