Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
08.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.1995 [1995/22] |
17.08.1994 | Change - applicant | published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] |
22.04.1994 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.06.1994 [1994/23] |
28.07.1993 | Change - representative | published on 15.09.1993 [1993/37] |
13.07.1992 | First examination report | |
15.04.1992 | Change - representative | published on 03.06.1992 [1992/23] |
19.04.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.06.1991 [1991/23] |
19.04.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.06.1991 [1991/23] |