EP0435002 - Sealing glass and magnetic head comprising the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.1992 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.10.1992 [1992/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mizuno, Yasuo 67-1-105, Ikaganishi-machi Hirakata-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Ikeda, Masaki 37-15, Yamadaike Higashi-machi Hirakata-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Yoshida, Akihiko 19-13, Yamanote-cho, Korien Hirakata-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [1991/27] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 90122746.2 | 28.11.1990 | [1991/27] | Priority number, date | JP19890309647 | 29.11.1989 Original published format: JP 30964789 | [1991/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0435002 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C03C8/24, C03C3/072 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
G11B5/193 (EP);
C03C3/072 (EP);
C03C8/245 (EP);
G11B5/133 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/27] | Title | German: | Abdichtungsglas und Magnetkopf, der es enthält | [1991/27] | English: | Sealing glass and magnetic head comprising the same | [1991/27] | French: | Verre de scellement et tête magnétique le contenant | [1991/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 28.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 31.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]SU833615 ; | [A]JP1009833 ; | [X]US3723835 ; | [X]US2245541 ; | [X]GB1103078 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 95, no. 20, 16 November 1981 Columbus, Ohio, USA page 316; ref. no. 174234F & SU-A-833615 (SSRIG) (30-05-81), & SU833615 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 111, no. 6, 07 August 1989 Columbus, Ohio, USA page 308; ref. no. 44189H & JP-A-1009833 (MATSUSHITA EL.IND.) (13-01-89), & JP1009833 A 19890807 |