EP0438670 - Light emitting type push button for telephone sets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.01.1997 [1997/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krösen, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Pappelweg 3 W-4294 Isselburg-Anholt / DE | 02 /
Blöchl, Franz, Dipl.-Ing. Carl-Isert-Weg 3 W-4190 Bocholt-Lowick / DE | [1991/31] | Application number, filing date | 90122765.2 | 28.11.1990 | [1991/31] | Priority number, date | DE19900000828U | 25.01.1990 Original published format: DE 9000828 U | [1991/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0438670 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0438670 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0438670 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/22, H01H13/02 | [1991/31] | CPC: |
H01H13/705 (EP);
H04M1/22 (EP);
H01H2219/014 (EP);
H01H2219/04 (EP);
H01H2219/06 (EP);
H01H2219/062 (EP);
H01H2231/022 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/31] | Title | German: | Taste mit Leuchtanzeige für Fernsprechgeräte | [1991/31] | English: | Light emitting type push button for telephone sets | [1991/31] | French: | Bouton poussoir lumineux pour postes téléphoniques | [1991/31] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/31] | 11.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP1159917 ; | [E]JP3112020 ; | [A]JP1134827 ; | [XP]US4924044 (TAKAHASHI YOSHIYA [JP], et al); | [A]GB2140210 (NITSUKO LTD); | [A]US4491692 (LEE SHAN S [TW]); | [A]EP0342747 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]DE2825833 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG); | [A]DE8436320U | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 429 (E-823)25. September 1989 & JP-A-1 159 917 ( MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND. CO. LTD. ) 22. Juni 1989, & JP1159917 A 00000000 | [E] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 308 (E-1097)7. August 1991 & JP-A-3 112 020 ( HITACHI TEREKOMU TECHNOL K.K. ) 13. Mai 1991, & JP3112020 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 317 (E-789)19. Juli 1989 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 383 (E-811)24. August 1989 & JP-A-1 134 827 ( FUJITSU LTD ) 26. Mai 1989, & JP1134827 A 00000000 | Examination | JP1086419 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 317 (E-789)19. Juli 1989 & JP-A- 1 086 419, & JP1086419 A 00000000 |