EP0430227 - Elastic synthetic polymer filament with multi-lobated cross-sectional profile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1994 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.1994 [1994/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7, Minamihonmmachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0054 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/23] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7, Minamihonmachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawakami, Kenji 2750-1, Minamiyoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi, Ehime 791 / JP | 02 /
Nagai, Hiroyuki 1291, Takaoda, Tobe-cho Iyo-gun, Ehime 791-11 / JP | 03 /
Fujita, Masakazu 1-13-3, Shikanodai Kita Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-01 / JP | [1991/23] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/23] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 90122807.2 | 29.11.1990 | [1991/23] | Priority number, date | JP19890312691 | 01.12.1989 Original published format: JP 31269189 | [1991/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0430227 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0430227 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0430227 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D01D5/253, D01F6/86, D01F6/80, D01F6/70 | [1991/23] | CPC: |
D01F6/70 (EP,US);
D01D5/253 (EP,KR,US);
D01F6/80 (EP,US);
D01F6/86 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2929 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/23] | Title | German: | Elastisches, synthetisches Filament mit multilobalem Querschnitt | [1991/23] | English: | Elastic synthetic polymer filament with multi-lobated cross-sectional profile | [1991/23] | French: | Filament synthétique élastique à section multilobée | [1991/23] | Examination procedure | 03.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/48] | 27.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1383858 (DU PONT); | [A]FR2125920 (DU PONT); | [A]EP0233702 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) |