EP0431485 - Cooling system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 11.02.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Klosterstrasse 20 8406 Winterthur / CH | [2008/39] |
Former [1991/24] | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Demuth, Robert Maulackerstrasse 17 CH-8309 Nürensdorf / CH | 02 /
Erni, Daniel Zürcherstrasse 18 CH-8500 Frauenfeld / CH | 03 /
Fritzsche, Peter Im Eichbühl 18 CH-8405 Winterthur / CH | [1991/24] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/34] | MANITZ, FINSTERWALD & PARTNER Postfach 22 16 11 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90122915.3 | 30.11.1990 | [1991/24] | Priority number, date | CH19890004371 | 06.12.1989 Original published format: CH 437189 | [1991/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0431485 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0431485 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D01G15/12, D01G15/16, D01G15/32 | [1991/24] | CPC: |
D01G15/12 (EP,US);
D01G15/16 (EP,US);
D01G15/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1991/24] | Title | German: | Kühlsystem | [1991/24] | English: | Cooling system | [1991/24] | French: | Système de refroidissement | [1991/24] | Examination procedure | 18.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/25] | 28.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.04.1998
ADMISSIBLE Trützschler GmbH & Co. KG Duvenstrasse 82-92, Postfach 41 01 64 D-41199 Mönchengladbach / DE | [1998/22] | 06.07.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.02.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 12.11.1999 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2000/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 06.08.1997 | CH | 30.11.1997 | LI | 30.11.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [1998/50] | CH | 30.11.1997 | |
LI | 30.11.1997 | ||
FR | 02.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/35] | FR | 02.01.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0167722 (KLEINEWEFERS RAMISCH GMBH [DE]); | [AD]EP0077166 (CARDING SPEC CANADA [CA]); | [A]CH390109 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]); | [A]GB191303173 (TURNBULL GEORGE) |