EP0431486 - Power failure in a card room [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Klosterstrasse 20 8406 Winterthur / CH | [2008/39] |
Former [1991/24] | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Röösli, Hans Gutrainstrasse 37 CH-8303 Bassersdorf / CH | 02 /
Müller, Christian Lindenstrasse 17 CH-9500 Wil SG / CH | 03 /
Demuth, Robert Maulackerstrasse 17 CH-8309 Nürensdorf / CH | [1991/24] | Application number, filing date | 90122916.1 | 30.11.1990 | [1991/24] | Priority number, date | CH19890004403 | 07.12.1989 Original published format: CH 440389 | [1991/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0431486 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0431486 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D01G15/36, H02J3/30 | [1991/24] | CPC: |
D01G15/36 (EP);
H02J3/30 (EP);
H02J9/066 (EP);
Y02E60/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1991/24] | Title | German: | Netzausfall in der Karderie | [1991/24] | English: | Power failure in a card room | [1991/24] | French: | Panne de secteur dans une carderie | [1991/24] | Examination procedure | 23.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/24] | 10.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Request for further processing for: | 15.04.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 15.04.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.05.1999 | Decision despatched | 07.05.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 07.05.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 02.06.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 25.09.2002 | GB | 25.09.2002 | CH | 30.11.2002 | LI | 30.11.2002 | ES | 28.03.2003 | [2004/35] |
Former [2004/21] | GB | 25.09.2002 | |
CH | 30.11.2002 | ||
LI | 30.11.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | CH | 30.11.2002 | |
LI | 30.11.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/40] | CH | 30.11.2002 | |
LI | 30.11.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]BE675331 ; | [YD]CH581714 ; | [AD]DE3633627 ; | [A]US4172692 ; | [A]FR2252684 ; | [A]US4339779 ; | [AD]DE3708211 ; | [AD]DE3347113 |