EP0431497 - Double-acting spraying and/or dosing hand pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.1993 [1993/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hofmann, Jörg Kreuzstrasse 11 D-97892 Kreuzwertheim / DE | [1991/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/24] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Postfach 44 01 51 D-80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90123018.5 | 30.11.1990 | [1991/24] | Priority number, date | DE19893940101 | 04.12.1989 Original published format: DE 3940101 | [1991/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0431497 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0431497 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B05B11/00 | [1991/24] | CPC: |
B05B11/1088 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, IT, NL [1991/24] | Title | German: | Handbetätigbare, doppelt wirkende Dosier- und/oder Zerstäuberpumpe | [1991/24] | English: | Double-acting spraying and/or dosing hand pump | [1991/24] | French: | Pompe à main à double effet de dosage et/ou de pulvérisation | [1991/24] | File destroyed: | 28.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 22.05.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/13] | 30.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.09.1992 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1486392 (RUDOLF ALBERT); | [Y]FR2349749 (EMSON RES [US]); | [Y]FR2532010 (REALEX CORP [US]) |