Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] |
18.02.1994 | (Expected) grant | published on 06.04.1994 [1994/14] |
15.09.1992 | First examination report | |
23.10.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.12.1991 [1991/50] |
26.04.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.06.1991 [1991/24] |