EP0431555 - Phase change material for cold use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1995 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL ENGINEERING CO., LTD. 5-4, Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states JAPAN ETHANOL COMPANY LIMITED 25-5, Toranomon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states TOKYO GAS CO., LTD. 5-20, Kaigan 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0022 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL ENGINEERING CO., LTD. 5-4, Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states JAPAN ETHANOL COMPANY LIMITED 25-5, Toranomon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
For all designated states TOKYO GAS CO., LTD. 5-20, Kaigan 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koizumi, Yaunori, c/o Yokkaichi Factory Japan Ethanol Co. Ltd., 3-71, Obata 3-chome Yokkaichi-shi, Mie-ken / JP | 02 /
Oka, Masahiro, c/o Yokkaichi Division, Mitsubishi Petrochemical Eng. Co., Ltd., 1000, Kawajiri-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie-ken / JP | 03 /
Hashimito, Ryoichi 5-6-104, Susukino 2-chome, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1991/24] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90123212.4 | 04.12.1990 | [1991/24] | Priority number, date | JP19890313422 | 04.12.1989 Original published format: JP 31342289 | [1991/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0431555 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0431555 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/06 | [1991/24] | CPC: |
C09K5/066 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1991/24] | Title | German: | Bei Tieftemperaturen anwendbares Phasenveränderungsmaterial | [1991/24] | English: | Phase change material for cold use | [1991/24] | French: | Matériau à changement de phase utilisable à basse température | [1991/24] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/50] | 21.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0290666 ; | [Y]DE2436511 ; | [Y]US4476687 ; | [A]FR2620723 |