EP0489187 - Sanitary appliance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.1994 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.1994 [1994/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebr. OTTO KG Gewerbepark 7 35764 Sinn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/24] | For all designated states Gebr. OTTO KG Gewerbepark 7 D-35764 Sinn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ritter, Karl Konrad Haydnstrasse 11 W-5240 Betzdorf / DE | [1992/24] | Representative(s) | Fitzner, Ulrich Fitzner & Frese PartGmbH Rechtsanwalt - Patentanwälte Hauser Ring 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/24] | Fitzner, Ulrich, Dr. Konrad-Adenauer-Platz 17 D-40852 Ratingen-Lintorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 90123283.5 | 05.12.1990 | [1992/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0489187 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E03D9/00, E04H1/12 | [1992/24] | CPC: |
E03D7/00 (EP);
E03D11/12 (EP);
E03D9/00 (EP);
E04H1/1266 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/24] | Title | German: | Sanitäranlage | [1992/24] | English: | Sanitary appliance | [1992/24] | French: | Appareil sanitaire | [1992/24] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 27.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/24] | 16.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/12] | 22.10.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1994/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.06.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8703633 ; | [A]EP0162397 ; | [A]US2145435 ; | [A]US3869732 |