blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0432638

EP0432638 - Combination preparations comprising chloramphenicol, gentamicin and nystatin as active substances for topical treatment of skin inflammation diseases [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.07.1994
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 12.06.2002  [2002/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Abdulla, Souhail, Dr. med.
Rhauderwieke 1
D-26817 Rhauderfehn / DE
[1991/25]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1991/25]
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1991/25]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
D-22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date90123404.706.12.1990
[1991/25]
Priority number, dateDE1989394126314.12.1989         Original published format: DE 3941263
[1991/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0432638
Date:19.06.1991
Language:DE
[1991/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0432638
Date:15.09.1993
Language:DE
[1993/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.1991
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/71
[1991/25]
CPC:
A61K31/70 (EP,US); A61P17/00 (EP); A61P29/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1991/25]
TitleGerman:Kombinationspräparate enthaltend Chloramphenicol, Gentamicin und Nystatin als aktive Wirkstoffe zur topischen Behandlung entzündlicher Hauterkrankungen[1991/25]
English:Combination preparations comprising chloramphenicol, gentamicin and nystatin as active substances for topical treatment of skin inflammation diseases[1991/25]
French:Préparations d'associations contenant du chloramphénicol, de la gentamicine et de la nystatine comme substances actives pour le traitement topique des maladies d'inflammation de la peau[1991/25]
Examination procedure28.09.1991Examination requested  [1991/48]
17.03.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.09.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
26.02.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
17.03.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.05.1993Fee for grant paid
24.05.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.06.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.1992Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES15.09.1993
GR15.09.1993
[2002/24]
Former [2000/04]GR15.09.1993
Documents cited:Search[Y]  - UNLISTED DRUGS, Band 35, Nr. 2, Februar 1983, Seite 23d, Chatham, NJ, US
 [Y]  - UNLISTED DRUGS, Band 22, Nr. 8, August 1970, Seite 118b, Chatham, NJ, US; Seite 118b: "Cavumycina"
 [A]  - UNLISTED DRUGS, Band 18, Nr. 7, Juli 1966, Seite 65b, Chatham, NJ, US
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.