EP0489938 - Device for feeding small quantities of treating bath onto moving textile materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Babcock Textilmaschinen GmbH Postfach 3148 21209 Seevetal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states Babcock Textilmaschinen GmbH Postfach 3148 D-21209 Seevetal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tischbein, Claus, Dipl.- Ing. Wittenhögen 12 W-2110 Buchholz 24 / DE | [1992/25] | Representative(s) | Planker, Karl-Josef Babcock-BSH AG vormals Büttner-Schilde-Haas AG, Postfach 6 47811 Krefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/18] | Planker, Karl Josef, Dipl.-Phys. Babcock-BSH AG vormals Büttner-Schilde-Haas AG, Postfach 6 D-47811 Krefeld / DE | ||
Former [1992/25] | Planker, Karl-Josef, Dipl.-Phys. Babcock-BSH AG vormals Büttner-Schilde-Haas AG Postfach 6 D-47811 Krefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 90123520.0 | 07.12.1990 | [1992/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0489938 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0489938 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D06B23/28 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
D06B23/28 (EP);
D06B1/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/32] |
Former [1992/25] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Anordnung zum Aufbringen geringer Flüssigkeitsmengen auf laufende Textilbahnen oder dergl. | [1992/25] | English: | Device for feeding small quantities of treating bath onto moving textile materials | [1992/25] | French: | Appareillage pour apporter de petites quantités de liquide de traitement sur des matières textiles en déplacement | [1992/25] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1991 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DK | 27.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/34] | 18.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.01.1992 | DK   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.03.1996 | ES | 20.03.1996 | FR | 20.03.1996 | GB | 20.03.1996 | IT | 20.03.1996 | NL | 20.03.1996 | SE | 20.06.1996 | AT | 07.12.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | BE | 20.03.1996 | |
ES | 20.03.1996 | ||
GB | 20.03.1996 | ||
IT | 20.03.1996 | ||
NL | 20.03.1996 | ||
SE | 20.06.1996 | ||
FR | 14.08.1996 | ||
AT | 07.12.1996 | ||
Former [2002/24] | BE | 20.03.1996 | |
ES | 20.03.1996 | ||
GB | 20.03.1996 | ||
IT | 20.03.1996 | ||
SE | 20.06.1996 | ||
FR | 14.08.1996 | ||
AT | 07.12.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 20.03.1996 | |
GB | 20.03.1996 | ||
IT | 20.03.1996 | ||
SE | 20.06.1996 | ||
FR | 14.08.1996 | ||
AT | 07.12.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 20.03.1996 | |
GB | 20.03.1996 | ||
SE | 20.06.1996 | ||
FR | 14.08.1996 | ||
AT | 07.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/14] | BE | 20.03.1996 | |
GB | 20.03.1996 | ||
SE | 20.06.1996 | ||
FR | 14.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/12] | BE | 20.03.1996 | |
SE | 20.06.1996 | ||
FR | 14.08.1996 | ||
Former [1996/52] | BE | 20.03.1996 | |
SE | 20.06.1996 | ||
Former [1996/44] | SE | 20.06.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3707859 ; | [A]US4311114 ; | [A]GB1328151 ; | [A]GB2208010 ; | [A]US3635191 |