EP0432663 - Apparatus for forming micro-holes in cigarettes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/25] | Apparatus for forming micro-holes on rod-like matters | ||
[1994/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.1995 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 2-1 Toranomon, 2-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/25] | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 2-1 Toranomon, 2-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Komori, Mikio, c/o Japan Tobacco Inc. Machine Technology R & D Center, 2-20-46 Horifune Kita-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Adachi, Kazuyu, c/o Japan Tobacco Inc. Machine Technology R & D Center, 2-20-46 Horifune Kita-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Sato, Shuichi, c/o Japan Tobacco Inc. Machine Technology R & D Center, 2-20-46 Horifune Kita-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1991/25] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/25] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Postfach 44 01 51 D-80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90123561.4 | 07.12.1990 | [1991/25] | Priority number, date | JP19890317562 | 08.12.1989 Original published format: JP 31756289 | [1991/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0432663 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0432663 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/06, A24C5/60 | [1991/25] | CPC: |
B23K26/0676 (EP,US);
A24C5/606 (EP,US);
B23K26/067 (EP,US);
Y10S131/904 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1991/25] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Herstellung von Mikro-Bohrungen in Zigaretten | [1994/30] | English: | Apparatus for forming micro-holes in cigarettes | [1994/30] | French: | Appareil pour former des micro-perforations dans des cigarettes | [1994/30] |
Former [1991/25] | Gerät zur Herstellung von Mikro-Bohrungen auf stabähnlichen Stoffen | ||
Former [1991/25] | Apparatus for forming micro-holes on rod-like matters | ||
Former [1991/25] | Appareil pour former des micro-trous dans des matières du type bâtons | Examination procedure | 19.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/25] | 21.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP6192793 ; | [A]FR2403034 (HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG [DE]); | [Y]EP0292666 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 267 (M-516)(2323) 11 September 1986, & JP-A-61 92793 (TOSHIBA CORP) 10 May 1986,, & JP6192793 A 19860510 |