Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.12.1994 [1994/51] |
12.11.1993 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.12.1993 [1993/52] |
29.05.1992 | First examination report | |
07.08.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 25.09.1991 [1991/39] |
16.02.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.04.1991 [1991/14] |