EP0436150 - Method and apparatus for setting a given withwise tension to a moving sheet-like material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Babcock Textilmaschinen GmbH Postfach 3148 21209 Seevetal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/28] | For all designated states Babcock Textilmaschinen GmbH Postfach 3148 D-21209 Seevetal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gottschalk, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Schulenburgring 50 W-2050 Hamburg / DE | [1991/28] | Representative(s) | Planker, Karl-Josef Babcock-BSH AG vormals Büttner-Schilde-Haas AG, Postfach 6 47811 Krefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/18] | Planker, Karl Josef, Dipl.-Phys. Babcock-BSH AG vormals Büttner-Schilde-Haas AG, Postfach 6 D-47811 Krefeld / DE | ||
Former [1992/04] | Planker, Karl-Josef, Dipl.-Phys. Babcock-BSH AG vormals Büttner-Schilde-Haas AG Postfach 6 D-47811 Krefeld / DE | ||
Former [1991/28] | Struck, Willi, Dr.-Ing. Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 10f D-2080 Pinneberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 90123717.2 | 10.12.1990 | [1991/28] | Priority number, date | DE19893940850 | 11.12.1989 Original published format: DE 3940850 | [1991/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0436150 | Date: | 10.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0436150 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D06C3/02 | [1991/28] | CPC: |
D06C3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zur Einstellung einer definierten Spannung in breitgeführten laufenden Warenbahnen | [1991/28] | English: | Method and apparatus for setting a given withwise tension to a moving sheet-like material | [1991/28] | French: | Procédé et installation pour imposer une tension transversale définie à une matière en bande en déplacement | [1991/28] | Examination procedure | 29.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/39] | 01.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.10.1994 | ES | 19.10.1994 | FR | 19.10.1994 | NL | 19.10.1994 | SE | 19.01.1995 | [2004/35] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 19.10.1994 | |
ES | 19.10.1994 | ||
NL | 19.10.1994 | ||
SE | 19.01.1995 | ||
FR | 17.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/36] | BE | 19.10.1994 | |
NL | 19.10.1994 | ||
SE | 19.01.1995 | ||
FR | 17.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/35] | BE | 19.10.1994 | |
NL | 19.10.1994 | ||
SE | 19.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/30] | BE | 19.10.1994 | |
SE | 19.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/29] | SE | 19.01.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3180002 (CRANDON NASH JOHN); | [A]US3382554 (CARLYLE HARMON, et al); | [A]US3551970 (COHN EUGENE, et al); | [A]US3748704 (SCHMIDT W, et al); | [A]DE3026910 (KOLB GMBH & CO HANS [DE]); | [A]GB2136465 (BRUECKNER TROCKENTECHNIK KG); | [A]DE3611351 (BRUECKNER TROCKENTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) | Examination | DE1629384 |