Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0437727 | Global Dossier | 10.11.1993 | B1 | EP0437727 | 11.09.1991 | A3 | EP0437727 | 24.07.1991 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE4000879 | 13.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4000879 | 18.07.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4000879 | 13.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59003472D1 | 16.12.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE4000879 | 13.01.1990 |