EP0435056 - Method for continuous marking of elongated articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1995 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states kabelmetal electro GmbH Postfach 260 30002 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | For all designated states kabelmetal electro GmbH Postfach 260 D-30002 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klebl, Wolfram, Dipl.-Ing. Sieversdamm 2b W-3004 Isernhagen 2 / DE | 02 /
Brünn, Rainer Schmiedeweg 10 W-3031 Essel / DE | [1991/27] | Application number, filing date | 90123732.1 | 10.12.1990 | [1991/27] | Priority number, date | DE19893942483 | 22.12.1989 Original published format: DE 3942483 | [1991/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0435056 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0435056 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0435056 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01B13/00 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
H01B13/345 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, IT, LI [1991/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur fortlaufenden Kennzeichnung von langgestrecktem Gut | [1991/27] | English: | Method for continuous marking of elongated articles | [1991/27] | French: | Méthode de marquage continu de matériaux allongés | [1991/27] | Examination procedure | 18.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/33] | 24.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2373835 (BOEING CO [US]); | [A]US4387665 (CLINTON HENRY H [US]) |