EP0438691 - Process for the preparation of substituted 2-chloropyridines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/31] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaufmann, Dieter, Dr. Peter-Walterscheidt-Strasse 89 W-5060 Bergisch-Gladbach 2 / DE | 02 /
Jelich, Klaus, Dr. Paul-Ehrlich-Strasse 2 W-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | 03 /
Braden, Rudolf, Dr. Nothauserfeld 1 W-5068 Odenthal / DE | 04 /
Rosen, Winfried, Dr. Pahlkestrasse 5 W-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | [1991/31] | Application number, filing date | 90123776.8 | 11.12.1990 | [1991/31] | Priority number, date | DE19904001248 | 18.01.1990 Original published format: DE 4001248 | DE19904020055 | 23.06.1990 Original published format: DE 4020055 | [1991/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0438691 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0438691 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/61 | [1991/31] | CPC: |
C07D213/61 (EP,US);
C07D213/06 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von substituierten 2-Chlorpyridinen | [1991/31] | English: | Process for the preparation of substituted 2-chloropyridines | [1991/31] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de chloro-2 pyridines substituées | [1991/31] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/31] | 28.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1200304 (LEUNA WERKE VEB); | [A]US4628096 (NELSON RICHARD V [US], et al) |