Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0433897
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
07.08.1998 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.09.1998 [1998/39] |
15.08.1997 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.10.1997 [1997/40] |
21.03.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.01.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.12.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
31.10.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
16.01.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
05.01.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.02.1995 |
First examination report |
|
09.02.1993 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.03.1993 [1993/13] |
15.06.1992 |
Publication of search report |
published on 05.08.1992 [1992/32] |
09.05.1991 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.06.1991 [1991/26] |