EP0433897 - Process for preparing an optically active cyclobutane nucleoside [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.1998 [1998/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E.R. Squibb & Sons, Inc. P.O.Box 4000 Princeton New Jersey 08543-4000 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/26] | For all designated states E.R. SQUIBB & SONS, INC. P.O.Box 4000 Princeton New Jersey 08543-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bisacchi, Gregory S. 22 Blue Ridge Road Titusville, New Jersey 08560 / US | 02 /
Mitt, Toomas 1312 Aspen Drive Plainsboro, New Jersey 08536 / US | [1991/26] | Representative(s) | Josif, Albert, et al Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/26] | Josif, Albert, Dr.-Ing., et al Baaderstrasse 3 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90124123.2 | 13.12.1990 | [1991/26] | Priority number, date | US19890451664 | 18.12.1989 Original published format: US 451664 | [1991/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0433897 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0433897 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0433897 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D473/00, C07C235/40, C07C243/08, C07F7/18 | [1991/26] | CPC: |
C07D473/00 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
C07C235/40 (EP,US);
C07C243/08 (EP,US);
C07F7/1804 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von optisch aktiven Zyklobutannukleosiden | [1991/26] | English: | Process for preparing an optically active cyclobutane nucleoside | [1991/26] | French: | Procédé de préparation de nucléosides dérivés de cyclobutane optiquement actifs | [1991/26] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/13] | 03.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0335355 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]); | [AP]EP0358154 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]); | [AP]EP0366059 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) |